U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cv-03025
  • Case Name: Tyndall et al v. Iowa, State of et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Continue]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Strike]
  • May 02, 2022: [Sealed Motion Access to Selected Parties]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Set Aside/Reconsider Order]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • December 08, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • October 11, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
October, 2020
  • October 21, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 21, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • October 02, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
September, 2020
  • September 24, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • September 15, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • May 18, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 18, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • May 18, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
January, 2020
  • January 09, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
December, 2019
  • December 16, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.