U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cv-00095
  • Case Name: Tomelleri v. Lee Enterprises, Incorporated
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 02, 2020: [Report regarding Copyright]
  • April 01, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • March 09, 2020: [Closing Documents]
  • March 09, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 02, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • February 24, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • February 19, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • February 17, 2020: [Change Venue]
  • February 10, 2020: [Order]
  • February 10, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • February 10, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 10, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
January, 2020
  • January 22, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 16, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • January 16, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 15, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
December, 2019
  • December 16, 2019: [Report regarding Copyright]
  • December 16, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.