U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cv-00031
  • Case Name: Middendorf v. Ennis, et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 10, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • June 09, 2021: [Stipulation]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • May 17, 2021: [Closing Documents]
  • May 12, 2021: [Trial Brief]
  • May 12, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • May 11, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 07, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • May 06, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 06, 2021: [Order]
  • May 01, 2021: [Stipulation]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • April 30, 2021: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • April 30, 2021: [Affidavit]
  • April 29, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • April 29, 2021: [Affidavit]
  • April 28, 2021: [Pretrial Order - Final]
  • April 28, 2021: [Affidavit]
  • April 27, 2021: [Pretrial Conference - Final]
  • April 24, 2021: [Trial Brief]
  • April 24, 2021: [Statement]
  • April 24, 2021: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • April 24, 2021: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • April 23, 2021: [Statement]
  • April 23, 2021: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • April 23, 2021: [Proposed Pretrial Order]
  • April 23, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • April 21, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • April 20, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • April 16, 2021: [Order]
  • April 13, 2021: [In Limine]
  • April 06, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
March, 2021
  • March 25, 2021: [Status Conference]
February, 2021
  • February 09, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • February 09, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • February 08, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 28, 2021: [Order]
  • January 27, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • January 22, 2021: [Status Report]
  • January 15, 2021: [Continue]
  • January 08, 2021: [Order]
  • January 08, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
October, 2020
  • October 13, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • October 12, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 08, 2020: [Notice - Other]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Compel]
  • July 30, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 30, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 07, 2020: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • July 07, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 02, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 02, 2020: [Protective Order]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
  • June 30, 2020: [Order]
  • June 30, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 30, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • June 29, 2020: [~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • June 27, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • June 26, 2020: [Order]
  • June 26, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • June 25, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • June 17, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 15, 2020: [Designation of Expert Witnesses]
  • June 15, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • June 02, 2020: [Reply]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 20, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • May 12, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • May 12, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • May 08, 2020: [Compel]
  • May 06, 2020: [Declaration]
  • May 06, 2020: [Compel]
  • May 05, 2020: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Compel]
  • April 28, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • April 28, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • April 28, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • April 28, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • April 27, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • April 23, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • April 23, 2020: [Declaration]
  • April 22, 2020: [Order]
  • April 21, 2020: [Compel]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • March 06, 2020: [Order]
  • March 06, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 04, 2020: [Status Conference]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • February 27, 2020: [Answer to Crossclaim]
  • February 24, 2020: [Order]
  • February 24, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • February 19, 2020: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • February 14, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • February 11, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 11, 2020: [Errata]
  • February 11, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • February 06, 2020: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • February 06, 2020: [Counterclaim]
  • February 06, 2020: [Crossclaim]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • January 30, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 30, 2020: [Order]
  • January 30, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • January 30, 2020: [Counterclaim]
  • January 30, 2020: [Status Report]
  • January 29, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 22, 2020: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • January 21, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • January 16, 2020: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • January 16, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • January 15, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 06, 2020: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • January 06, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • December 17, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 16, 2019: [Leave to File]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.