U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00412
  • Case Name: Putco, Inc. v. Shenzhen Aurora Technology Co., Ltd.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • January 24, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • January 07, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • January 03, 2022: [Dismiss]
October, 2021
  • October 06, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • October 01, 2021: [Status Report]
July, 2021
  • July 02, 2021: [Order]
  • July 01, 2021: [Status Report]
April, 2021
  • April 05, 2021: [Order]
  • April 01, 2021: [Status Report]
January, 2021
  • January 20, 2021: [Order]
  • January 14, 2021: [Status Report]
September, 2020
  • September 15, 2020: [Order]
  • September 14, 2020: [Status Report]
June, 2020
  • June 15, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 05, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 05, 2020: [Expedite]
  • June 01, 2020: [Certificate]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Expedite]
  • May 29, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 29, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 20, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • March 19, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • March 19, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
January, 2020
  • January 10, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • January 03, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • December 23, 2019: [Report Regarding Patent & Trademark]
  • December 20, 2019: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • December 20, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.