U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cv-00098
  • Case Name: Parish v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 11, 2020: [Judgment]
  • September 11, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Telephone Conference]
  • August 12, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 12, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 12, 2020: [Continue]
  • August 04, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 27, 2020: [Defendants Responsive Brief - Social Security Cases]
June, 2020
  • June 04, 2020: [Plaintiffs Brief - Social Security Cases]
April, 2020
  • April 24, 2020: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 23, 2020: [Order]
  • April 23, 2020: [Transcript - Social Security]
  • April 23, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 23, 2020: [Notice of Dismissal R16/Service - Clerk]
February, 2020
  • February 20, 2020: [Summons Issued]
January, 2020
  • January 03, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 20, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.