U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cv-00097
  • Case Name: Jones v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 12, 2020: [Judgment]
  • June 12, 2020: [Order]
  • June 10, 2020: [Telephone Conference]
  • June 01, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Order]
  • May 27, 2020: [Defendants Responsive Brief - Social Security Cases]
April, 2020
  • April 24, 2020: [Order]
  • April 24, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [Plaintiffs Brief - Social Security Cases]
  • March 02, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 02, 2020: [Order]
  • March 02, 2020: [Transcript - Social Security]
  • March 02, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
December, 2019
  • December 26, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • December 26, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 20, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 20, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.