U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cv-00099
  • Case Name: Neely v. KraftHeinz Food Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 10, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • November 09, 2020: [Notice of Consent]
  • November 09, 2020: [Dismiss]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 09, 2020: [Closing Documents]
  • October 09, 2020: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
August, 2020
  • August 12, 2020: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • August 12, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • August 11, 2020: [Sealed Document]
June, 2020
  • June 04, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • February 26, 2020: [Order]
  • February 26, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • February 26, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • February 19, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • February 18, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 11, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 11, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • February 06, 2020: [Order]
  • February 06, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • February 05, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • February 05, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • December 23, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.