U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00416
  • Case Name: Ceja Mendoza v. Valone et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • March 31, 2020: [Letter]
  • March 30, 2020: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • March 23, 2020: [Reply]
  • March 17, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • March 03, 2020: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
January, 2020
  • January 14, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 13, 2020: [Substitute Party]
  • January 09, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 09, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Substitute Party]
  • December 27, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • December 26, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • December 26, 2019: [Notice of Removal By USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.