U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00417
  • Case Name: Lakeshore Indianola, LLC et al v. Havenpark Capital Partners, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • April 23, 2021: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 29, 2021: [Closing Documents]
  • March 29, 2021: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • March 29, 2021: [Order]
  • March 29, 2021: [Settlement Conference]
  • March 23, 2021: [In Limine]
  • March 16, 2021: [Order]
  • March 16, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 16, 2021: [Status Conference]
November, 2020
  • November 05, 2020: [Errata]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • October 23, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • October 23, 2020: [Reply]
  • October 16, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • October 16, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
  • September 24, 2020: [Errata]
  • September 24, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 22, 2020: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • September 16, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
August, 2020
  • August 11, 2020: [Sealed Document]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • May 29, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
April, 2020
  • April 07, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
February, 2020
  • February 13, 2020: [Status Report]
  • February 10, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • February 07, 2020: [Protective Order]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Status Report Order]
  • January 31, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 31, 2020: [Order]
  • January 31, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • January 31, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • January 29, 2020: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • January 29, 2020: [Counterclaim]
  • January 23, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • January 23, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • January 09, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • January 09, 2020: [Order]
  • January 09, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 08, 2020: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
  • January 08, 2020: [Counterclaim]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • December 26, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.