U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00382
  • Case Name: Davis et al v. Dawson et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • January 17, 2023: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
  • January 10, 2023: [Closing Documents]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Settlement Conference]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order]
  • December 07, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order]
  • August 15, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • August 11, 2022: [Motion in Limine]
  • August 09, 2022: [Status Report]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • June 07, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • June 30, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • June 28, 2021: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • June 25, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
  • June 17, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
April, 2021
  • April 06, 2021: [1 - Terminate Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • April 06, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 06, 2021: [Order]
  • April 01, 2021: [Pretrial Conference - Final]
  • April 01, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • March 29, 2021: [Witness List]
  • March 29, 2021: [Proposed Pretrial Order]
  • March 29, 2021: [Trial Brief]
  • March 29, 2021: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • March 29, 2021: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • March 04, 2021: [In Limine]
November, 2020
  • November 03, 2020: [Dismiss]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • October 19, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • October 15, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • October 15, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • October 14, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 14, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • October 13, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 13, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • October 13, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
  • October 13, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • October 10, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
April, 2020
  • April 21, 2020: [Status Conference]
January, 2020
  • January 21, 2020: [Order]
  • January 21, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • January 21, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • January 16, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • January 16, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 13, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • January 06, 2020: [Order]
  • January 06, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 02, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.