U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00001
  • Case Name: Gomez v. Fuller et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Notice - Other]
September, 2021
  • September 14, 2021: [Attorney Fees]
  • September 12, 2021: [Attorney Fees]
August, 2021
  • August 05, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • August 04, 2021: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 20, 2021: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • July 20, 2021: [Closing Documents]
  • July 20, 2021: [Notice of Settlement]
May, 2021
  • May 04, 2021: [Status Conference]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Status Report]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 28, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • January 27, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • October 30, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • October 30, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • October 30, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
September, 2020
  • September 02, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • September 01, 2020: [Leave to File]
  • September 01, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 01, 2020: [Leave]
  • September 01, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
August, 2020
  • August 06, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • July 28, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 28, 2020: [Order]
  • July 28, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 28, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • July 24, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 24, 2020: [Status Report]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
  • July 01, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
June, 2020
  • June 23, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • June 19, 2020: [Waiver]
  • June 18, 2020: [Set/Reset Trial Management Order Deadlines]
  • June 17, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • June 16, 2020: [Order]
  • June 16, 2020: [Errata]
  • June 11, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • June 04, 2020: [Order]
  • June 04, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • June 04, 2020: [Continue]
May, 2020
  • May 15, 2020: [Errata]
  • May 14, 2020: [Order]
  • May 14, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • May 14, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
April, 2020
  • April 20, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 17, 2020: [Order]
  • April 15, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 03, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 02, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 02, 2020: [Errata]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • February 27, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 19, 2020: [Request for Waiver of Service]
  • February 18, 2020: [Initial Review Order]
  • February 07, 2020: [Certification of Inmate Account]
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: [Order]
  • January 02, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 02, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.