U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00004
  • Case Name: Hamre et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • July 19, 2021: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
  • July 07, 2021: [Closing Documents]
  • July 07, 2021: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • July 07, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 07, 2021: [Notice of Settlement]
  • July 06, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • July 02, 2021: [Proposed Pretrial Order]
  • July 02, 2021: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • July 02, 2021: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • July 02, 2021: [Statement]
  • July 02, 2021: [Errata]
  • July 02, 2021: [In Limine]
  • July 02, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • July 02, 2021: [Witness List]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • June 22, 2021: [In Limine]
  • June 16, 2021: [In Limine]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • May 27, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2021
  • March 15, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 15, 2021: [Order]
  • March 12, 2021: [Status Report]
  • March 01, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
February, 2021
  • February 01, 2021: [Errata]
  • February 01, 2021: [Reply]
January, 2021
  • January 25, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • January 04, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
December, 2020
  • December 03, 2020: [Order]
  • December 03, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • December 03, 2020: [Status Report]
October, 2020
  • October 13, 2020: [Status Report Order]
  • October 13, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 09, 2020: [Status Report]
September, 2020
  • September 16, 2020: [Notice - Other]
July, 2020
  • July 22, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 22, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 21, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2020
  • May 05, 2020: [Order]
  • May 05, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 05, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • May 01, 2020: [Status Report]
April, 2020
  • April 01, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • April 01, 2020: [Order]
  • April 01, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
January, 2020
  • January 21, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 16, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • January 06, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 03, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • January 02, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.