U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-00001
  • Case Name: Chesmore v. Social Security Administration, et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 17, 2020: [Judgment]
  • November 16, 2020: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • October 01, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
September, 2020
  • September 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time re Transcript]
  • September 08, 2020: [Extension of Time re Transcript]
  • September 08, 2020: [Status Report]
August, 2020
  • August 03, 2020: [Dismiss]
July, 2020
  • July 24, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • July 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time re Transcript]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • June 30, 2020: [Extension of Time re Transcript]
  • June 30, 2020: [Status Report]
  • June 02, 2020: [Stay]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Stay]
March, 2020
  • March 06, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • March 04, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • February 18, 2020: [Order]
  • February 18, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
January, 2020
  • January 02, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 02, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.