U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-00003
  • Case Name: Raybna, LLC et al v. Jersey Mike's Franchise Systems, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 13, 2020: [Case Stayed]
  • May 13, 2020: [Compel]
February, 2020
  • February 11, 2020: [Seal]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Reply]
  • January 21, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • January 09, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • January 08, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • January 07, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • January 06, 2020: [Compel]
  • January 06, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • January 06, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • January 06, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • January 03, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • January 03, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.