U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00005
  • Case Name: Brown v. Gibbs
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
October, 2021
  • October 08, 2021: [USCA Order]
  • October 08, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 07, 2021: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • October 07, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
  • October 06, 2021: [Certificate of Appealability]
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • September 14, 2021: [Certificate of Appealability]
  • September 10, 2021: [Judgment]
  • September 09, 2021: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
October, 2020
  • October 01, 2020: [Brief /Other]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • September 25, 2020: [Submission of State Court Documents (Attorney General only)]
  • September 14, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • September 11, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
August, 2020
  • August 12, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • August 11, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
July, 2020
  • July 13, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • July 10, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
June, 2020
  • June 12, 2020: [Brief /Other]
April, 2020
  • April 09, 2020: [Order]
  • April 09, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [Submission of State Court Documents (Attorney General only)]
  • January 27, 2020: [Response to Habeas Petition]
  • January 27, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 23, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 23, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 06, 2020: [Waiver]
  • January 06, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 06, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 06, 2020: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.