U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00007
  • Case Name: The Wittern Group, Inc., et al v. Bauer et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 12, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • May 11, 2021: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
April, 2021
  • April 06, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • April 06, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • April 01, 2021: [Status Report]
  • April 01, 2021: [Notice - Other]
March, 2021
  • March 03, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 01, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Status Report]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Status Report]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Status Report]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Status Report]
June, 2020
  • June 04, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 03, 2020: [Status Report]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • February 24, 2020: [Order]
  • February 24, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • February 24, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • February 17, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • February 04, 2020: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • February 03, 2020: [Notice - Other]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Order]
  • January 28, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 27, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • January 27, 2020: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
  • January 21, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • January 09, 2020: [Affidavit]
  • January 09, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • January 08, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 08, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • January 07, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • January 07, 2020: [Errata]
  • January 07, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • January 07, 2020: [Certificate]
  • January 07, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.