U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00011
  • Case Name: Campbell v. State of Iowa
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 09, 2020: [Judgment]
  • June 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
May, 2020
  • May 12, 2020: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • May 12, 2020: [Submission of State Court Documents (Attorney General only)]
April, 2020
  • April 11, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 07, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 07, 2020: [Reply]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 30, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 30, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 20, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 20, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 20, 2020: [Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
February, 2020
  • February 19, 2020: [Order]
  • February 19, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
January, 2020
  • January 22, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • January 09, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 09, 2020: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.