U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-00005
  • Case Name: Doe v. Stephen et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • December 09, 2022: [Order]
  • December 05, 2022: [Status Conference]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • November 14, 2022: [Brief /Other]
  • November 14, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Declaration]
  • October 13, 2022: [Declaration]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Order]
  • September 29, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • September 15, 2022: [Brief /Other]
  • September 12, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • September 02, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Supplement/Addendum]
  • August 24, 2022: [Brief /Other]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
  • July 27, 2022: [Sanctions]
  • July 27, 2022: [Strike]
  • July 27, 2022: [Motion in Limine]
  • July 26, 2022: [Order]
  • July 25, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • July 22, 2022: [Objections - Generic]
  • July 22, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • July 20, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • July 19, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 11, 2022: [Brief /Other]
  • July 05, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 05, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • July 05, 2022: [Order]
  • July 01, 2022: [Pretrial Conference - Final]
  • July 01, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • June 30, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 29, 2022: [Reply]
  • June 29, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • June 28, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • June 28, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • June 28, 2022: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • June 28, 2022: [Trial Brief]
  • June 28, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
  • June 27, 2022: [Reply]
  • June 24, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
  • June 24, 2022: [Reply]
  • June 22, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • June 22, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • June 22, 2022: [Reply]
  • June 22, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • June 22, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
  • June 21, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • June 17, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • June 15, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • June 10, 2022: [Reply]
  • June 10, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • June 10, 2022: [Witness List]
  • June 10, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • June 10, 2022: [Strike]
  • June 10, 2022: [In Limine]
  • June 10, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • June 10, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • June 10, 2022: [Sanctions]
  • June 10, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • June 06, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • June 03, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
  • June 03, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 03, 2022: [Objections - Generic]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Trial Brief]
  • May 05, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Reply]
  • April 26, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
  • April 19, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • April 11, 2022: [Status Report]
  • April 05, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2022
  • March 04, 2022: [Status Report]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • February 22, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • February 17, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • February 10, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • February 02, 2022: [Motion in Limine]
  • February 02, 2022: [Certify Class]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Order]
  • January 19, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order]
  • January 07, 2022: [Continue]
  • January 06, 2022: [Continue]
  • January 04, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • January 04, 2022: [Status Report]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Continue]
  • December 14, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • December 10, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • December 09, 2021: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • December 07, 2021: [Default Entry by Clerk]
  • December 07, 2021: [Default Judgment]
  • December 07, 2021: [In Limine]
  • December 03, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • December 03, 2021: [Continue]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Reply]
  • October 15, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • October 08, 2021: [Certify Class]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 23, 2021: [Certify Class]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Reply]
  • July 16, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • July 07, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 06, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • July 02, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Certify Class]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • May 24, 2021: [Certify Class]
  • May 03, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 03, 2021: [Affidavit]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • April 07, 2021: [Reply]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • March 01, 2021: [Certify Class]
February, 2021
  • February 03, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • February 03, 2021: [Status Report]
December, 2020
  • December 17, 2020: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • December 03, 2020: [Continue]
October, 2020
  • October 06, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 06, 2020: [Order]
  • October 06, 2020: [~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • October 06, 2020: [Status Conference]
September, 2020
  • September 11, 2020: [Continue]
July, 2020
  • July 22, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 22, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 21, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 16, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Order]
  • June 30, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • June 30, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • June 23, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • June 23, 2020: [Order on Motion to Remand to State Court]
  • June 15, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • June 12, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • June 12, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 11, 2020: [Reply]
  • June 05, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • June 04, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • June 04, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • June 04, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
May, 2020
  • May 21, 2020: [Remand to State Court]
  • May 21, 2020: [Dismiss]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 28, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • April 28, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • April 13, 2020: [Order]
  • April 13, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 10, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
March, 2020
  • March 04, 2020: [Compel]
  • March 04, 2020: [Stay]
February, 2020
  • February 20, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 19, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 18, 2020: [Reply]
  • February 18, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 14, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • February 14, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 11, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • February 11, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • February 10, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • January 28, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • January 27, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • January 22, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • January 22, 2020: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
  • January 16, 2020: [Stay]
  • January 16, 2020: [Compel]
  • January 15, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • January 15, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 14, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • January 09, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.