U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-00006
  • Case Name: Surratt v. Leep TQC, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 10, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • December 09, 2020: [Dismiss]
November, 2020
  • November 12, 2020: [Closing Documents]
August, 2020
  • August 10, 2020: [Designation of Expert Witnesses]
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2020
  • April 03, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 03, 2020: [Order]
  • April 03, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • April 03, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • April 01, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • April 01, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2020
  • March 27, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • March 26, 2020: [Order]
  • March 26, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • March 23, 2020: [Reply]
  • March 10, 2020: [Order]
  • March 10, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 10, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • March 10, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 09, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • March 09, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
February, 2020
  • February 10, 2020: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • February 06, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • February 06, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
January, 2020
  • January 21, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 13, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • January 12, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.