U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00017
  • Case Name: Duncan v. International Markets Live, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order]
  • January 06, 2023: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Trial Exhibits]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Brief /Other]
  • July 05, 2022: [Brief /Other]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Transcript]
  • June 14, 2022: [Brief /Other]
  • June 13, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Witness List]
  • May 18, 2022: [Bench Trial - Begun and Completed - One Day]
  • May 18, 2022: [LR 83E Exhibits]
  • May 18, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • May 10, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 04, 2022: [Trial Brief]
  • May 04, 2022: [Witness List]
  • May 04, 2022: [Exhibit List]
January, 2022
  • January 06, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Status Report]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Status Report]
March, 2021
  • March 25, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 25, 2021: [Status Report]
January, 2021
  • January 14, 2021: [Status Report]
November, 2020
  • November 17, 2020: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • November 17, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • November 16, 2020: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • November 12, 2020: [Supplement/Addendum]
  • November 11, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
  • November 11, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • November 06, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 06, 2020: [Compel]
October, 2020
  • October 06, 2020: [Status Report]
September, 2020
  • September 23, 2020: [Stay]
  • September 14, 2020: [Reply]
  • September 08, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • September 02, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 01, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Status Report]
  • August 24, 2020: [Reply]
  • August 17, 2020: [Certificate]
  • August 17, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • August 17, 2020: [Order Referring Motion]
  • August 17, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • August 14, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • August 11, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • August 03, 2020: [Compel]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Stay]
  • July 06, 2020: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • July 02, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • June 29, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 26, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • June 26, 2020: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • June 08, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 08, 2020: [Counterclaim]
  • June 08, 2020: [Leave to File]
  • June 08, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 06, 2020: [Leave]
  • June 05, 2020: [Leave]
  • June 05, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 01, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • May 26, 2020: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • May 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • April 13, 2020: [Remand]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Reply]
  • February 26, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • February 12, 2020: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • February 11, 2020: [Reply]
  • February 11, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • February 11, 2020: [Order]
  • February 11, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • February 11, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • February 11, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 10, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • February 06, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • February 04, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • February 03, 2020: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
  • February 03, 2020: [Counterclaim]
  • February 03, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: [Remand]
  • January 21, 2020: [Order]
  • January 21, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 21, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • January 21, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • January 20, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 20, 2020: [Counterclaim]
  • January 14, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • January 14, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 14, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 13, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.