U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-00007
  • Case Name: Mullink v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 04, 2021: [Judgment]
December, 2020
  • December 31, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Response to Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
  • August 21, 2020: [Objection to Report and Recommendations]
  • August 19, 2020: [Reply]
  • August 07, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
June, 2020
  • June 01, 2020: [Defendants Responsive Brief - Social Security Cases]
May, 2020
  • May 05, 2020: [Brief /Other]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Social Security Briefing Schedule Order]
  • March 30, 2020: [Transcript - Social Security]
  • March 30, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
January, 2020
  • January 14, 2020: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for RR]
  • January 14, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • January 14, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • January 13, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.