U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00018
  • Case Name: Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc. v. Swaim
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 11, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • March 10, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • March 07, 2021: [Dismiss]
February, 2021
  • February 08, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • February 07, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
January, 2021
  • January 07, 2021: [Closing Documents]
  • January 07, 2021: [Settlement Conference]
October, 2020
  • October 31, 2020: [Order]
  • October 31, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • October 23, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 08, 2020: [Status Conference]
August, 2020
  • August 17, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • August 17, 2020: [Order]
  • August 13, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • August 13, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Order]
  • April 28, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 28, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • April 13, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • April 13, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 13, 2020: [Order]
  • April 13, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • April 13, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • April 13, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • April 10, 2020: [Order]
  • April 10, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
March, 2020
  • March 09, 2020: [Transfer Case]
  • March 04, 2020: [Reply]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • February 12, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • February 12, 2020: [Transfer Case]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 15, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • January 14, 2020: [Public Docket Annotation]
  • January 14, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.