U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-00009
  • Case Name: Fowler v. Matteson Marine Services, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 05, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • October 02, 2020: [Stipulation]
June, 2020
  • June 26, 2020: [Order]
  • June 25, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 25, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • June 24, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 16, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2020
  • April 15, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 14, 2020: [Order]
  • April 14, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • April 14, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • April 10, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
March, 2020
  • March 04, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
February, 2020
  • February 04, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • February 04, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 03, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • February 03, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 03, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • January 24, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 16, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 16, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • January 16, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.