U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00022
  • Case Name: Hodge v. Winfield Solutions, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Order]
  • June 22, 2021: [Bill of Costs]
  • June 08, 2021: [Judgment]
  • June 08, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • June 04, 2021: [Reply]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • May 25, 2021: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • May 21, 2021: [In Limine]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
January, 2021
  • January 15, 2021: [Reply]
  • January 08, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
December, 2020
  • December 21, 2020: [Errata]
  • December 18, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
November, 2020
  • November 06, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • November 03, 2020: [Protective Order]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • September 27, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 16, 2020: [Continue]
August, 2020
  • August 10, 2020: [Stipulation]
June, 2020
  • June 12, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • June 05, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • June 05, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • May 26, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 22, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 22, 2020: [Reply]
  • May 15, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
March, 2020
  • March 09, 2020: [Order]
  • March 09, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • March 09, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 09, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • March 09, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • February 24, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 21, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 21, 2020: [Continue]
  • February 19, 2020: [Order]
  • February 19, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • January 23, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • January 23, 2020: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
  • January 21, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • January 16, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 16, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • January 16, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.