U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00023
  • Case Name: Dowding v. Chariton Police Department et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 07, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • July 06, 2020: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
May, 2020
  • May 05, 2020: [Order]
  • May 05, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • May 05, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • May 04, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • April 28, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • April 15, 2020: [Order]
  • April 15, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 13, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
January, 2020
  • January 17, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • January 16, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.