U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00024
  • Case Name: Reserve National Insurance Company v. Murphy et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 07, 2020: [Judgment]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 30, 2020: [Permanent Injunction]
  • June 23, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • June 09, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • June 09, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2020
  • April 17, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • April 14, 2020: [Telephone Conference]
  • April 01, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [Reply]
  • March 19, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • March 05, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • March 05, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 05, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • March 03, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 02, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 02, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 20, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 19, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
  • February 06, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 04, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
January, 2020
  • January 22, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 22, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • January 21, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 21, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.