U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-00011
  • Case Name: White v. Carleton Life Support Systems, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 06, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • July 02, 2020: [Dismiss]
June, 2020
  • June 11, 2020: [Order]
  • June 11, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • June 11, 2020: [Status Report]
May, 2020
  • May 08, 2020: [Order]
  • May 08, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • May 08, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • May 07, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • May 05, 2020: [Notice of Dismissal R16/Service - Clerk]
March, 2020
  • March 19, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • March 18, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
February, 2020
  • February 20, 2020: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • February 19, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • February 13, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • February 13, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 12, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • February 12, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • February 12, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 11, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • January 22, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.