U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-00010
  • Case Name: Scott v. Salyers et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 02, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
May, 2020
  • May 08, 2020: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
March, 2020
  • March 17, 2020: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 17, 2020: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • March 09, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
  • March 06, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Amended Document - NOT Motion]
  • February 24, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • February 07, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • February 06, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
January, 2020
  • January 22, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 22, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.