U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00026
  • Case Name: Leveke v. Sarcone et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 18, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • February 11, 2020: [Judgment]
  • February 11, 2020: [Initial Review Order]
  • February 11, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 07, 2020: [Letter]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 23, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 22, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • January 22, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.