U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00028
  • Case Name: Blomdahl v. State of Iowa
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 18, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
  • August 11, 2020: [USCA Order]
July, 2020
  • July 07, 2020: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
March, 2020
  • March 24, 2020: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 23, 2020: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • February 27, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • February 26, 2020: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • February 24, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
  • February 03, 2020: [Letter]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Judgment]
  • January 28, 2020: [Order]
  • January 22, 2020: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.