open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

IOWA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa
    Case Number:20-00110
    Party Name:B-40 Farms LLC
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F. [Relief from Stay]
    Date Published:March 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F. [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:March 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F. [Relief from Stay (No Fee)]
    Date Published:March 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F. [Notice to BNC (all creditors)]
    Date Published:February 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F. [Order (Generic)]
    Date Published:February 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F. [Generic Order]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F. [Amended/Nunc Pro Tunc Order]
    Date Published:February 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F. [Employ]
    Date Published:February 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F. [Objection]
    Date Published:February 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
    Date Published:February 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F. [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
    Date Published:February 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F. [Adequate Protection]
    Date Published:February 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F. [Relief from Stay (Fee)]
    Date Published:February 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F. [Prohibit Use Cash Collateral]
    Date Published:February 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F. [Hearing Set/Continued]
    Date Published:February 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F. [zGeneric Motion]
    Date Published:February 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F. [Proceeding Memo - Text]
    Date Published:January 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F. [Appear pro hac vice]
    Date Published:January 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F. [Response ]
    Date Published:January 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F. [Setting/Continuing Hearing - bk]
    Date Published:January 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:January 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F. [Use Cash Collateral]
    Date Published:January 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 12]
    Date Published:January 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F. [Chapter 12 Deposit for Court Costs]
    Date Published:January 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F. [Notice And Order re Incomplete Filing]
    Date Published:January 24, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.ianb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?104080
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =