open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

IOWA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa
    Case Number:20-00128-lmj13
    Party Name:Anthony David Meyers and Kacie Lynn Meyers
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F [Compensation]
    Date Published:March 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F [Docket Text Only Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:March 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F [Withdrawal of Objection to Plan]
    Date Published:March 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F [Objection]
    Date Published:March 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F [Notice of Withdrawal of Claim]
    Date Published:March 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F [Notice of Bar Date - 30 day]
    Date Published:February 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F [Objection to Claim]
    Date Published:February 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F [Report of 341 Meeting (Module)]
    Date Published:February 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F [Debtor's (for Joint Debtor only) Financial Management Course Certificate and/or Official Form 423]
    Date Published:February 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F [Debtor's Financial Management Course Certificate and/or Official Form 423]
    Date Published:February 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F [Judge Jackwig Hearing]
    Date Published:February 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F [Objection to Plan]
    Date Published:February 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings - AutoDocket]
    Date Published:January 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:January 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:January 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F [Notice Request]
    Date Published:January 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F [Order RE: Duties of Debtors - Chp 13]
    Date Published:January 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F [341 Meeting - Ch13]
    Date Published:January 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F [notice of bar date - Plan Chapter 13]
    Date Published:January 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F [Debtor (for Joint Debtor only) Certificate of Budget and Credit Counseling Course]
    Date Published:January 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F [Employee Income Record]
    Date Published:January 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F [Debtor Certificate of Budget and Credit Counseling Course]
    Date Published:January 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F [Chapter 13 Calculation of Your Disposable Income (122C-2)]
    Date Published:January 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F [none]
    Date Published:January 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F [Voluntary Petition Chapter 13]
    Date Published:January 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:January 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F [Chapter 13 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income (122C-1)]
    Date Published:January 24, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.iasb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?149591
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =