U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00030
  • Case Name: Miller v. Hill County District Court, Texas
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 27, 2020: [Letter]
  • April 27, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • April 24, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Certification of Inmate Account]
  • February 27, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • February 03, 2020: [Order]
  • February 03, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.