U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00371
  • Case Name: Ratliff v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 16, 2021: [Mail Returned]
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: [Judgment]
  • July 21, 2021: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 23, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • June 05, 2020: [Errata]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • May 01, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 16, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [Brief /Other]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.