U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00032
  • Case Name: Agan v. State of Iowa et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 15, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 08, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
April, 2020
  • April 14, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • April 13, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Order]
  • February 05, 2020: [Brief /Other]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • January 28, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • January 28, 2020: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
  • January 28, 2020: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.