U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00003
  • Case Name: Barnhouse et al v. Malvern Bank et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 15, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • September 13, 2020: [Stipulation]
August, 2020
  • August 14, 2020: [Closing Documents]
  • August 14, 2020: [Notice of Settlement]
  • August 13, 2020: [Status Conference]
July, 2020
  • July 06, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
June, 2020
  • June 23, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • June 08, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • June 03, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • June 03, 2020: [Order]
  • June 03, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • June 03, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
May, 2020
  • May 20, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • April 27, 2020: [Order]
  • April 27, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • April 15, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
March, 2020
  • March 17, 2020: [Reply]
  • March 10, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • February 18, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • February 06, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 06, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.