U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00044
  • Case Name: Alexander et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 08, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • June 07, 2021: [Stipulation]
May, 2021
  • May 14, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • May 14, 2021: [Stipulation]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Continue]
  • April 29, 2021: [Continue]
  • April 29, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • April 16, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [Letter]
  • March 16, 2021: [Closing Documents]
  • March 16, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 16, 2021: [Order]
  • March 16, 2021: [Notice of Settlement]
  • March 11, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 08, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • March 05, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • March 04, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 03, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • February 02, 2021: [Status Report]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: [Reply]
  • January 27, 2021: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • January 26, 2021: [Leave]
  • January 26, 2021: [Reply]
  • January 20, 2021: [Errata]
  • January 19, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • January 04, 2021: [Reconsideration]
  • January 04, 2021: [Leave]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • December 29, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • December 07, 2020: [Dismiss]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: [Status Report]
October, 2020
  • October 05, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 05, 2020: [Status Report]
August, 2020
  • August 10, 2020: [Reply]
  • August 03, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
July, 2020
  • July 20, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • July 20, 2020: [Dismiss]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • June 29, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • June 25, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 19, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • June 17, 2020: [Leave to File]
  • June 17, 2020: [Leave]
  • June 09, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • June 09, 2020: [Order]
  • June 09, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • June 09, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • June 03, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • June 02, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
May, 2020
  • May 14, 2020: [Order]
  • May 14, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 11, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
April, 2020
  • April 16, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 16, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • April 15, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • April 14, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • April 09, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • April 09, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2020
  • March 06, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
February, 2020
  • February 11, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • February 10, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 10, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.