U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00004
  • Case Name: Brodie et al v. Foxhoven et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 19, 2020: [Judgment]
  • October 09, 2020: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • October 08, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 25, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 25, 2020: [Compel]
  • September 03, 2020: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 03, 2020: [Order]
  • September 02, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Reply]
  • August 28, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • August 26, 2020: [Compel]
  • August 21, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 21, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • August 07, 2020: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
July, 2020
  • July 06, 2020: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 02, 2020: [Brief /Other]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 26, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 12, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 11, 2020: [Reply]
  • May 06, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 06, 2020: [Order]
  • May 05, 2020: [Leave to File]
  • May 05, 2020: [Leave]
  • May 05, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 22, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 13, 2020: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 13, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 02, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
March, 2020
  • March 04, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
February, 2020
  • February 13, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 13, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • February 11, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • February 10, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.