U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00045
  • Case Name: Sanders v. Iowa Correctional Institution for Women
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 05, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • June 04, 2020: [Order]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • April 27, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
March, 2020
  • March 11, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 11, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
February, 2020
  • February 10, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 10, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • February 10, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • February 10, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.