U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00047
  • Case Name: Hodges v. John Doe (A)
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 13, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • November 12, 2020: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
  • November 11, 2020: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
August, 2020
  • August 14, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 11, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 04, 2020: [Reply]
  • August 03, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
July, 2020
  • July 21, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • July 21, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • July 09, 2020: [Dismiss]
April, 2020
  • April 08, 2020: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • April 07, 2020: [Leave to File]
  • April 07, 2020: [Leave]
  • April 06, 2020: [Leave]
  • April 02, 2020: [Order]
  • April 02, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • April 02, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • March 31, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 30, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 26, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • March 19, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 02, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 20, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • February 19, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 18, 2020: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • February 18, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • February 18, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • February 13, 2020: [Notice of Consent]
  • February 11, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • February 10, 2020: [Certificate of Counsel]
  • February 10, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.