U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00049
  • Case Name: Rogers v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 02, 2021: [Attorney Fees]
  • June 01, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
May, 2021
  • May 17, 2021: [Attorney Fees]
March, 2021
  • March 08, 2021: [Judgment]
  • March 05, 2021: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
December, 2020
  • December 07, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
November, 2020
  • November 13, 2020: [Plaintiffs Reply Brief - Social Security Cases]
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: [Plaintiffs Brief - Social Security Cases]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Order]
  • June 30, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • June 30, 2020: [Transcript - Social Security]
  • June 30, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
May, 2020
  • May 06, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 05, 2020: [Stay]
  • May 01, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • May 01, 2020: [Stay]
April, 2020
  • April 07, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
February, 2020
  • February 12, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • February 11, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.