U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00013
  • Case Name: Cedar Poly, LLC v. ADG Solutions, Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 11, 2022: [Extension of Time]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Continue Trial]
  • May 18, 2022: [Leave to File Document]
  • May 16, 2022: [Continue Trial]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • February 08, 2022: [UNRESISTED Motion]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • January 14, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • January 13, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
June, 2021
  • June 18, 2021: [Continue Trial]
  • June 10, 2021: [Quash]
January, 2021
  • January 05, 2021: [Continue Trial]
December, 2020
  • December 21, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • September 30, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
July, 2020
  • July 22, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • July 09, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
June, 2020
  • June 09, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
February, 2020
  • February 12, 2020: [Dismiss]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.