U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00052
  • Case Name: Westwater v. Church et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • May 11, 2022: [USCA Order]
April, 2022
  • April 04, 2022: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • April 04, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 01, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
  • April 01, 2022: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
  • March 28, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
  • March 16, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 15, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 15, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2021
  • May 12, 2021: [Reply]
  • May 06, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • May 05, 2021: [Sealed Motion]
  • May 05, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • May 05, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
April, 2021
  • April 20, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • April 16, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • April 13, 2021: [Disbursement of Funds]
  • April 13, 2021: [Reply]
  • April 12, 2021: [Disbursement of Funds]
  • April 02, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • April 02, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 02, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • April 01, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 10, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 09, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • February 05, 2021: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • February 05, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Errata]
  • January 26, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • January 21, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 11, 2021: [Continue]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • November 19, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • November 16, 2020: [Order]
  • November 16, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • November 16, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 10, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • November 10, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: [Leave to File]
  • September 24, 2020: [Leave]
  • September 23, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 08, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • September 04, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 03, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 03, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: [Compel]
  • August 21, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • August 21, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • August 10, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 10, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • August 10, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 05, 2020: [Reply]
July, 2020
  • July 27, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • July 24, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • July 24, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 24, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • July 23, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • July 23, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • July 20, 2020: [Compel]
  • July 20, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 06, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 06, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
June, 2020
  • June 15, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • June 11, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 09, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
  • June 08, 2020: [Waiver]
  • June 08, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 18, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 13, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 13, 2020: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • May 12, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 11, 2020: [Notice - Other]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • April 30, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 10, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Letter]
  • March 25, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Filing Fee Received]
  • February 18, 2020: [Order]
  • February 13, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • February 13, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.