open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

IOWA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa
    Case Number:3:20-cr-00019-1
    Party Name:USA v. Moreno Godoy
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:July 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant of Arrest Returned Executed]
    Date Published:April 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:April 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue Trial - Davenport Case]
    Date Published:April 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Stipulated Discovery and Protective Order]
    Date Published:April 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bail/Bond Report (Sealed )]
    Date Published:March 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:March 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Statement]
    Date Published:March 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention]
    Date Published:March 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appointing Public Defender or CJA Panel Attorney]
    Date Published:March 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Setting Trial]
    Date Published:March 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:March 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:March 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Interpreter Needed]
    Date Published:March 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:March 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA23 - Financial Affidavit (Sealed)]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case Unsealed]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest - Other District]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Rule 5.c.3 Documents Received]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.iasd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?71120
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =