U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00005
  • Case Name: Smithfield Packaged Meats Sales Corp. v. Dietz & Watson, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 22, 2020: [Order]
  • October 22, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • October 22, 2020: [Status Report]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 14, 2020: [Transcript]
  • August 13, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • August 10, 2020: [Expedite]
  • August 06, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 05, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 05, 2020: [Reply]
  • August 04, 2020: [Declaration]
  • August 04, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Order]
  • July 29, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • July 29, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • July 28, 2020: [Order]
  • July 28, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • July 28, 2020: [Errata]
  • July 28, 2020: [Expedite]
  • July 27, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • July 24, 2020: [Order]
  • July 24, 2020: [Reply]
  • July 24, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • July 23, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • July 23, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • July 23, 2020: [Withdrawal of Document]
  • July 20, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • July 20, 2020: [Statement]
  • July 14, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 13, 2020: [Order]
  • July 07, 2020: [Reply]
  • July 06, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
  • July 06, 2020: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
  • July 01, 2020: [Joinder]
  • July 01, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 29, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • June 26, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • June 25, 2020: [Errata]
  • June 24, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • June 24, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • June 24, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 24, 2020: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • June 23, 2020: [Leave to File Under Seal]
May, 2020
  • May 06, 2020: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • May 06, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • May 05, 2020: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • May 04, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
  • May 04, 2020: [Errata]
  • May 04, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2020
  • April 27, 2020: [Transcript - Redacted]
  • April 17, 2020: [Redaction Request - Transcript]
  • April 14, 2020: [DOF/CRIS Deposit]
  • April 10, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 07, 2020: [Preliminary Injunction]
March, 2020
  • March 24, 2020: [Transcript]
  • March 20, 2020: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 17, 2020: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • March 09, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • March 09, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 04, 2020: [Order]
  • March 03, 2020: [LR 83E Exhibits]
  • March 03, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 02, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • February 28, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • February 26, 2020: [Compel]
  • February 26, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 26, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • February 25, 2020: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • February 25, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • February 24, 2020: [Errata]
  • February 24, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • February 24, 2020: [Order]
  • February 24, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • February 23, 2020: [Compel]
  • February 21, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • February 21, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • February 20, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • February 20, 2020: [Errata]
  • February 20, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • February 19, 2020: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • February 18, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • February 18, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 14, 2020: [Order]
  • February 14, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • February 14, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 14, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • February 14, 2020: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • February 14, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • February 13, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.