U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00054
  • Case Name: Roberts v. Thomas et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • March 29, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • March 19, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 19, 2021: [Closing Documents]
  • March 19, 2021: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • March 19, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 19, 2021: [Notice - Other]
December, 2020
  • December 02, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • December 01, 2020: [Dismiss]
November, 2020
  • November 02, 2020: [Order]
  • November 02, 2020: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • November 02, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
October, 2020
  • October 05, 2020: [Continue]
  • October 05, 2020: [Compel]
  • October 05, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • October 01, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 01, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
September, 2020
  • September 21, 2020: [Continue]
  • September 17, 2020: [Compel]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Sealed Document]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 13, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
March, 2020
  • March 27, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • March 27, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 23, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • March 13, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • March 13, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 13, 2020: [Order]
  • March 13, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • March 13, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • March 12, 2020: [Order]
  • March 11, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 09, 2020: [Errata]
  • March 06, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • March 05, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • March 03, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 03, 2020: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: [Order]
  • February 21, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • February 20, 2020: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
  • February 18, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • February 18, 2020: [Filing Fee Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.