U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00055
  • Case Name: Sanga v. U.S. Attorney General et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • June 29, 2022: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
March, 2022
  • March 10, 2022: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Status Report]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • November 22, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Order]
  • October 29, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • October 21, 2021: [Status Report]
  • October 21, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • September 28, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • September 23, 2021: [Order]
  • September 23, 2021: [Status Report]
July, 2021
  • July 07, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
April, 2021
  • April 05, 2021: [Order]
  • April 05, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 01, 2021: [Status Report]
March, 2021
  • March 17, 2021: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 16, 2021: [Order]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • January 29, 2021: [Notice - Other]
December, 2020
  • December 23, 2020: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • December 23, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • December 07, 2020: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • December 07, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • November 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
September, 2020
  • September 16, 2020: [Reply]
  • September 15, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • September 11, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
August, 2020
  • August 25, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • August 20, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • August 07, 2020: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • August 07, 2020: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • August 07, 2020: [Errata]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • July 29, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • July 16, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • July 08, 2020: [Errata]
  • July 02, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 01, 2020: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • July 01, 2020: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
June, 2020
  • June 16, 2020: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • June 15, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
May, 2020
  • May 11, 2020: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • May 11, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
February, 2020
  • February 19, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • February 18, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.