U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00006
  • Case Name: Cunningham v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Attorney Fees]
  • July 01, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Attorney Fees]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Judgment]
  • March 25, 2021: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Plaintiffs Reply Brief - Social Security Cases]
  • February 08, 2021: [Leave to File]
  • February 08, 2021: [Leave]
January, 2021
  • January 19, 2021: [Defendants Responsive Brief - Social Security Cases]
November, 2020
  • November 19, 2020: [Plaintiffs Brief - Social Security Cases]
October, 2020
  • October 02, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
September, 2020
  • September 21, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • September 21, 2020: [Order]
  • September 18, 2020: [Transcript - Social Security]
  • September 18, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
July, 2020
  • July 20, 2020: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • July 20, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
June, 2020
  • June 15, 2020: [Stay]
  • June 05, 2020: [Stay]
May, 2020
  • May 11, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
March, 2020
  • March 19, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • March 18, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
February, 2020
  • February 18, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 18, 2020: [Filing Fee Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.