U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00056
  • Case Name: Leveke v. Schneider
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 13, 2020: [Judgment]
  • April 13, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • April 11, 2020: [Initial Review Order]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • March 23, 2020: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • March 23, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 20, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2020
  • February 18, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • February 18, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 18, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.