U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:20-cv-02006
  • Case Name: Farm Bureau Property & Casualty Insurance Company v. HP Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 09, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • June 09, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
May, 2020
  • May 13, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • May 06, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
April, 2020
  • April 16, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 25, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • March 05, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
February, 2020
  • February 19, 2020: [More Definite Statement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.